WV HB4171 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Vetoed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-01 - Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide that school instructional terms for students begin no earlier than the day after Labor Day and end no later than the second Friday in June. The bill provides that in the event instructional days need to be cancelled the county boards of education must provide for ten technology days whereby assigned classwork may be completed. The bill also provides for homework packets be provided to students who do not have the necessary computer access at home.
Title
Relating to the public school calendar
Sponsors
Del. Roy Cooper [R] | Del. David Evans [R] | Del. George Ambler [R] | Del. David Perry [D] |
Del. Ricky Moye [D] | Del. Dana Lynch [D] | Del. John Kelly [R] | Del. Danny Wagner [R] |
Del. Ruth Rowan [R] | Sen. Randy Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 456) (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 356) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 356) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 190) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 189) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 183) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 356) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 356) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 190) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 189) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - Amendment adopted (Roll No 183) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-01 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/14/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/14/16 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/14/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 456) |
2016-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate effective date (Voice) |
2016-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur in changed effective date |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 356) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 356) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-02-26 | Senate | To Education |
2016-02-26 | Senate | To Education |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-25 | House | Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 190) |
2016-02-25 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 189) |
2016-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | Amendment adopted (Roll No 183) |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-01-20 | House | To House Education |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-20 | House | To Education |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4028 (Similar To) 2016-01-15 - To House Education
HB4298 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - To House Education
HB4298 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - To House Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 5 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |