WV HB4163 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 165, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 165, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing the authority and procedure for municipalities to give notice to, and publish the names of, entities delinquent in paying business and occupation taxes
Title
Providing the authority and procedure for municipalities to give notice to, and publish the names of, entities delinquent in paying business and occupation taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 350) (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 214) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 50) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 214) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 50) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 165, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-08 | House | Approved by Governor 3/8/16 |
2016-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/8/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/8/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/4/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-05 | Senate | To Governor 3/4/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-04 | House | To Governor 3/4/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-02 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 350) |
2016-03-02 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 214) |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2016-02-09 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-02-09 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 50) |
2016-02-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-08 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-05 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-04 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-03 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-01-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-01-27 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2016-01-20 | House | To House Political Subdivisions |
2016-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-20 | House | To Political Subdivisions then Judiciary |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 13 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 13 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |