WV HB4130 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 51, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 51, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create a separate criminal offense for the sale or purchase of a child from the offense contained in Article 22, Chapter 48 of the Code relating to adoptions. It creates a felony offense after the effective date of this section. This section is new; therefore, it has been completely underscored.
Title
Creating the felony criminal offense of sale or purchase of a child
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 154) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 154) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 51, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-04-02 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 4/2/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-27 | To Governor 3/27/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/27/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/27/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-09 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-08 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-08 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-08 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) | |
2012-03-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-08 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-07 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-06 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-06 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-05 | Reported do pass | |
2012-03-01 | To Judiciary | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-29 | Passed House (Roll No. 154) | |
2012-02-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-29 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-28 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-27 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-27 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-24 | By substitute, do pass | |
2012-02-10 | To House Finance | |
2012-02-10 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance | |
2012-01-19 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-19 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2012-01-19 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | 22 | 303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
48 | 22 | 803 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
61 | 2 | 14h | New Code | See Bill Text |