WV HB4123 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 295, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 295, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying that 911 telecommunication workers are included in the definition of those individuals who perform "emergency services" during a disaster
Title
Clarifying that 911 telecommunication workers are included in the definition of those individuals who perform "emergency services" during a disaster
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 762) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 525) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 524) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 204) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 525) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 524) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 204) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | House | Chapter 295, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 |
2020-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/19/20 - House Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-03-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 762) |
2020-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 525) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Constitutional Rule Suspended (Roll No. 524) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2020-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance |
2020-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-17 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 204) |
2020-02-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-30 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-30 | House | Do pass, but first to Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-13 | House | To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services |
2020-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-13 | House | To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Health and Human Resources |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 6 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
24 | 6 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |