WV HB4122 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-09 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-09 - To House Health and Human Resources
Pending: House Health & Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting a court to take into consideration a parent's drug or alcohol abuse when implementing a parenting plan
Title
Permitting a court to take into consideration a parent's drug or alcohol abuse when implementing a parenting plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - House rejected (Roll No. 155) (Y: 42 N: 55 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 154) (Y: 45 N: 51 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-24 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 154) (Y: 45 N: 51 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-09 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-09 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2014-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB230 (Similar To) 2014-01-08 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | 4 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 4 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 4 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 4 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 4 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 4 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 4 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 4 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14 | 4 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 20 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 9 | 209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |