WV HB4111 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-16 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-16 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit the Board of Physical Therapists to request an injunction for unauthorized practice. This section is new; therefore, it has been completely underscored.
Title
Relating to the authority by state boards of examinations and registration to apply for an injunction
Sponsors
Del. William Hartman [D] | Del. Barbara Hatfield [D] | Del. Jim Morgan [D] | Del. Dale Stephens [D] |
Del. Randal Swartzmiller [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 54) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | To Government Organization | |
2012-02-16 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-16 | House Message received | |
2012-02-15 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-15 | Passed House (Roll No. 54) | |
2012-02-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-15 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-14 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-13 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-13 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-10 | By substitute, do pass | |
2012-01-25 | To House Judiciary | |
2012-01-25 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2012-01-18 | To House Government Organization | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-18 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2012-01-18 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 13 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 16 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 20 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 21 | 14 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 22 | 26 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 23 | 27 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 26 | 19 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 30 | 25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 32 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 35 | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 37 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 4 | 25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 40 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 4B | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 5 | 23 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 6 | 28 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 14 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7C | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7D | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 9 | 27 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |