WV HB4094 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-27 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 4046
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-27 - Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 4046
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Consolidated Public Retirement Board to promulgate a legislative rule relating to refund, reinstatement, retroactive service, loan and correction of error interest factors.
Title
Consolidated Public Retirement Board, rule relating to refund, reinstatement, retroactive service, loan and correction of error interest factors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-27 | House | Reported in Com. Sub. for H. B. 4046 |
2016-01-29 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-01-29 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2016-01-18 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2016-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-18 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Judiciary |
2016-01-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB166 (Similar To) 2016-01-28 - To Judiciary