WV HB4083 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - To conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the West Virginia Parkways Authority to accept the use of credit and debit cards for paying tolls

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the West Virginia Parkways Authority to accept the use of credit and debit cards for paying tolls

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 470) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 392) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 114) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07SenateTo conference
2020-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-07SenateSenate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Swope, Roberts, Jeffries
2020-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-07HouseHouse appointed conferees: Jeffries, D., Hanna, Staggers
2020-03-07HouseHouse refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote)
2020-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-04SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-04SenateSenate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
2020-03-04SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-03HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 470)
2020-03-03HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-03SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-03-03SenateFloor Title amendment adopted
2020-03-03SenateCom Title amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2020-03-03SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 392)
2020-03-03SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-03SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-03-02SenateCommittee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-02SenateAmendment to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-02SenateCommittee Amendment Reported
2020-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-29SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 2/29/20
2020-02-29SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-28SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-28SenateImmediate consideration
2020-02-28SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2020-02-10SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2020-02-10SenateTo Transportation and Infrastructure
2020-02-10SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-02-07HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-07HousePassed House (Roll No. 114)
2020-02-07HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-07HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-06HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-05HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-05HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-04HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-30HouseTo House Government Organization
2020-01-30HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization
2020-01-10HouseTo House Technology and Infrastructure
2020-01-10HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-10HouseTo Technology and Infrastructure then Government Organization
2020-01-10HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1716A13bNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback