WV HB4021 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Budget Bill, making appropriations of public money out of the treasury in accordance with section fifty-one, article six of the Constitution

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Bill, making appropriations of public money out of the treasury in accordance with section fifty-one, article six of the Constitution

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2020-03-03HouseFrom Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
2020-03-02HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-29HouseRead 1st time
2020-02-29HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-28HouseBy substitute, do pass
2020-01-08HouseTo House Finance
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-08HouseTo Finance
2020-01-08HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback