WV HB4013 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 99, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to require voters to provide a photo identification when voting, to identify the requirements for those photo identifications, to set forth certain qualifying identification documents, to provide for provisional ballots to be cast by voters who do not possess the required photo identification, to allow for certain exemptions for those who live in nursing care facilities where precincts are located and those with religious objections to having their photograph taken, to update provisional ballot procedures, to provide for complimentary photo identification cards to a voter upon request and representation that the photo identification card is requested for the purpose of voting and, additionally, to establish procedures for persons over a certain age and lacking certain documents to acquire photo identification cards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring a person desiring to vote to present documentation identifying the voter

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-12 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 531) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 623) (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 414) (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-19 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 105) (Y: 59 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 97) (Y: 38 N: 60 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-18 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 96) (Y: 41 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-13HouseChapter 99, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
2016-03-15SenateApproved by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal
2016-03-15HouseApproved by Governor 4/1/2016 - House Journal
2016-04-01HouseApproved by Governor 4/1/2016
2016-03-23HouseTo Governor 3/23/16
2016-03-15HouseTo Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal
2016-03-15SenateTo Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal
2016-03-12SenateCompleted legislative action
2016-03-12SenateCommunicated to House
2016-03-12SenateSenate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 531)
2016-03-12SenateHouse Message received
2016-03-12HouseCommunicated to Senate
2016-03-12HouseHouse adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 623)
2016-03-12HouseConference report received-House
2016-03-12HouseConference report filed - House
2016-03-12SenateConference report filed - Senate
2016-03-12SenateHouse Message received
2016-03-12HouseTo conference
2016-03-12HouseCommunicated to Senate
2016-03-12HouseHouse appointed conferees: Lane, McCuskey, Rowe
2016-03-12HouseHouse agreed to conference
2016-03-12HouseHouse received Senate message
2016-03-12SenateCommunicated to House
2016-03-12SenateSenate appoints conference committee: Gaunch, Ferns, Palumbo
2016-03-12SenateSenate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote)
2016-03-12SenateHouse Message received
2016-03-12HouseCommunicated to Senate
2016-03-12HouseHouse refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice)
2016-03-12HouseHouse received Senate message
2016-03-11SenateSenate requests House to concur
2016-03-11SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 414)
2016-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2016-03-11SenateOn 3rd reading
2016-03-10SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2016-03-10SenateFloor amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
2016-03-10SenateCommittee Amendment Reported
2016-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2016-03-10SenateOn 2nd reading
2016-03-09SenateRead 1st time
2016-03-09SenateImmediate consideration
2016-03-09SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2016-02-20SenateTo Judiciary
2016-02-20SenateTo Judiciary
2016-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate
2016-02-20SenateHouse Message received
2016-02-19HouseCommunicated to Senate
2016-02-19HousePassed House (Roll No. 105)
2016-02-19HouseRead 3rd time
2016-02-19HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2016-02-18HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2016-02-18HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 97)
2016-02-18HouseAmendment rejected (Roll No. 96)
2016-02-18HouseRead 2nd time
2016-02-18HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2016-02-17HouseRead 1st time
2016-02-17HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2016-02-16HouseBy substitute, do pass
2016-02-01HouseTo House Judiciary
2016-02-01HouseIntroduced in House
2016-02-01HouseTo Judiciary
2016-02-01HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB5 (Similar To) 2016-01-13 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17B21Amended CodeCitation Text
3134Amended CodeCitation Text
3141Amended CodeCitation Text
3151New CodeSee Bill Text
3211Amended CodeCitation Text
3212Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4013&year=2016&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=hb4013%20intr.htm&yr=2016&sesstype=RS&i=4013
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4013%20SUB.htm&yr=2016&sesstype=RS&i=4013
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4013%20SUB%20ENG.htm&yr=2016&sesstype=RS&i=4013
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4013%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2016&sesstype=RS&i=4013
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB4013%20SUB%20ENR%20OFFICIAL.htm&yr=2016&sesstype=RS&i=4013
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/house/00096.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/house/00097.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/house/00105.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/senate/03-11-0414.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/house/00623.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2016/RS/votes/senate/03-12-0531.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback