WV HB4012 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - House received Senate message
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to create the West Virginia Religious Freedom Restoration Act to ensure that, in all cases where state action substantially burdens the exercise of religion, strict scrutiny is applied and to provide a claim or defense to a person or persons whose exercise of religion is substantially burdened by state action.
Title
West Virginia Religious Freedom Restoration Act
Sponsors
Del. John O'Neal [R] | Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Roger Hanshaw [R] | Del. Ricky Moye [D] |
Del. Tom Fast [R] | Del. Allen Evans [R] | Sen. Mike Azinger [R] | Del. Terry Waxman [R] |
Del. William Romine [R] | Del. Ruth Rowan [R] | Del. Linda Phillips [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 288) (Y: 7 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Palumbo Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 259) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Gaunch Amendments to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 258) (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 58) (Y: 66 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 57) (Y: 22 N: 75 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-10 - House - Decision of the chair sustained (Roll No. 56) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Palumbo Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 259) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Gaunch Amendments to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 258) (Y: 13 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 58) (Y: 66 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 57) (Y: 22 N: 75 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-10 - House - Decision of the chair sustained (Roll No. 56) (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Rejected by Senate (Roll No. 288) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Palumbo Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 259) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Gaunch Amendments to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 258) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-28 | Senate | Laid over on 1st reading 2/28/16 |
2016-02-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2016-02-12 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-12 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 58) |
2016-02-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-11 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-02-10 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2016-02-10 | House | Amendment ruled not germane |
2016-02-10 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2016-02-10 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 57) |
2016-02-10 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2016-02-10 | House | Decision of the chair sustained (Roll No. 56) |
2016-02-10 | House | Appeal decision of the chair |
2016-02-10 | House | Amendment ruled not germane |
2016-02-10 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2016-02-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-10 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-09 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2016-02-08 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-01-26 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-26 | House | To Judiciary |
2016-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB11 (Similar To) 2016-01-13 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 11C | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 11C | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 11C | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 11C | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 11C | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |