WV HB4012 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 19, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 19, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Removing the Commissioner of the Bureau for Public Health from certain boards
Title
Removing the Commissioner of the Bureau for Public Health from certain boards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 5) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 42) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 41) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 42) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 41) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 19, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-30 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/30/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/19/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-19 | To Governor 3/19/12 | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/19/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-10 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 5) | |
2012-03-10 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 5) | |
2012-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-10 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-08 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-07 | Reported do pass | |
2012-02-14 | To Government Organization | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-02-14 | House Message received | |
2012-02-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-02-13 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 42) | |
2012-02-13 | Passed House (Roll No. 41) | |
2012-02-13 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-13 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-10 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-02-09 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-09 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-02-08 | By substitute, do pass | |
2012-01-12 | To House Government Organization | |
2012-01-12 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-12 | To Government Organization | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 16 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 23 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 26 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 26 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |