WV HB4010 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-16 - Vetoed by Governor 3/28/08 - House Journal
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-16 - Vetoed by Governor 3/28/08 - House Journal
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to remove the limitation on terms for members on the board of library directors.
Title
Removing the limitation on terms for members on the board of library directors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-16 | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-28 | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/08 | |
2008-03-16 | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-17 | To Governor 3/17/08 | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/17/08 - House Journal | |
2008-03-16 | To Governor 3/17/08 - Senate Journal | |
2008-03-07 | House received Senate message | |
2008-03-07 | Completed legislative action | |
2008-03-07 | Communicated to House | |
2008-03-07 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 3) | |
2008-03-07 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 3) | |
2008-03-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-03-07 | On 3rd reading | |
2008-03-06 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-03-06 | On 2nd reading | |
2006-03-05 | Read 1st time | |
2006-03-05 | On 1st reading | |
2008-03-05 | Immediate consideration | |
2008-03-05 | Unanimous consent | |
2008-03-05 | Reported do pass | |
2008-01-22 | To Government Organization | |
2008-01-22 | To Government Organization | |
2008-01-22 | Introduced in Senate | |
2008-01-21 | Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-21 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 9) | |
2008-01-21 | Passed House (Roll No. 8) | |
2008-01-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2008-01-21 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2008-01-18 | Read 2nd time | |
2008-01-18 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2008-01-17 | Read 1st time | |
2008-01-17 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2008-01-16 | By substitute, do pass | |
2008-01-09 | To House Government Organization | |
2008-01-09 | Introduced in House | |
2008-01-09 | To Government Organization | |
2008-01-09 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4010&year=2008&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |