WV HB4007 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - Chapter 272, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 177) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 215) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 101) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 5) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15HouseChapter 272, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
2020-03-03HouseApproved by Governor 3/2/20 - House Journal
2020-03-02HouseApproved by Governor 3/2/20
2020-03-02SenateApproved by Governor 3/2/20 - Senate Journal
2020-02-28HouseTo Governor 2/27/20 - House Journal
2020-02-27HouseTo Governor 2/27/20
2020-02-27SenateTo Governor 2/27/20 - Senate Journal
2020-02-20HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-02-19SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-02-19SenateCommunicated to House
2020-02-19SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 177)
2020-02-19SenateHouse Message received
2020-02-18HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-02-18HousePassed House (Roll No. 215)
2020-02-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment with amendment (Voice)
2020-02-18HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-02-10SenateSenate requests House to concur
2020-02-10SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 101)
2020-02-10SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-10SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-07SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-07SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-06SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-06SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-05SenateReported do pass, with amendment and title amendment
2020-01-31SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-31SenateReported do pass, but first to Judiciary
2020-01-16SenateTo Health and Human Resources
2020-01-16SenateTo Health and Human Resources then Judiciary
2020-01-16SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-15HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-01-15HousePassed House (Roll No. 5)
2020-01-15HouseRead 3rd time
2020-01-15HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-14HouseRead 2nd time
2020-01-14HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-13HouseRead 1st time
2020-01-13HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-01-10HouseDo pass
2020-01-08HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-08HouseTo Health and Human Resources
2020-01-08HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB231 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
162P1New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback