WV HB4002 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 139, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Chapter 139, Acts, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to annual seminar requirements for professional licensing boards
Title
Relating to annual seminar requirements for professional licensing boards
Sponsors
Del. William Hartman [D] | Del. Barbara Hatfield [D] | Del. Jim Morgan [D] | Del. Margaret Staggers [D] |
Del. Dale Stephens [D] | Del. Joe Talbott [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 14) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 14) (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Chapter 139, Acts, 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Approved by Governor 3/14/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-14 | Approved by Governor 3/14/12 | |
2012-03-15 | Approved by Governor 3/14/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor 3/12/12 | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor 3/12/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor 3/12/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-06 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-06 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-06 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-06 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 6) | |
2012-03-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-06 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-03-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-05 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-03-02 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-02 | On 1st reading | |
2012-03-01 | Reported do pass | |
2012-01-26 | To Government Organization | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-01-26 | House Message received | |
2012-01-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-01-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 14) | |
2012-01-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-01-25 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2012-01-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-01-24 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2012-01-23 | Read 1st time | |
2012-01-23 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2012-01-20 | Do pass | |
2012-01-12 | To House Government Organization | |
2012-01-12 | Introduced in House | |
2012-01-12 | To Government Organization | |
2012-01-12 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 1 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |