WV HB3293 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 105, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 105, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to single-sex participation in interscholastic athletic events
Title
Relating to single-sex participation in interscholastic athletic events
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 581) (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 390) (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 283) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 282) (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 390) (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 283) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 282) (Y: 78 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 105, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/22/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-22 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Effective ninety days from passage |
2021-04-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 581) |
2021-04-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 390) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Motion to table bill rejected |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 4/7/21 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2021-03-26 | Senate | To Education |
2021-03-26 | Senate | To Education |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-25 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 283) |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 282) |
2021-03-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-03-18 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-18 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2021-03-18 | House | Originating in House Education |