WV HB3276 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-02 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-02 - To Government Organization
Pending: Senate Government Organization Committee
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to amend the Professional Surveyors Act.
Title
Amending the professional surveyors act
Sponsors
Del. Brent Boggs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | To Government Organization | |
2009-04-02 | To Government Organization | |
2009-04-02 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Communicated to Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 215) | |
2009-04-01 | Passed House (Roll No. 214) | |
2009-04-01 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-01 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-03-31 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-31 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-03-30 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-30 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2009-03-27 | By substitute, do pass | |
2009-03-23 | To House Government Organization | |
2009-03-23 | Introduced in House | |
2009-03-23 | To Government Organization | |
2009-03-23 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 13A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 13A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=3276&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |