WV HB3223 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB3223
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibit state, county, and municipal governments from dedicating or naming any public structure for a public official who is holding office at the time
Title
Prohibit state, county, and municipal governments from dedicating or naming any public structure for a public official who is holding office at the time
Sponsors
Del. Larry Pack [R] | Del. John Mandt [R] | Del. Kathie Crouse [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 369) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 198) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 198) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-17 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 369) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-23 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-23 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 198) |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-21 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-12 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-12 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3223 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 6 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 3 | 19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 12 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |