WV HB3158 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - On second reading to Finance
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-07 - On second reading to Finance
Summary
Providing assistance to certain political subdivision activities involving municipal policemen's and firemen's pensions and relief systems and volunteer fire departments
Title
Providing assistance to certain political subdivision activities involving municipal policemen's and firemen's pensions and relief systems and volunteer fire departments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-07 | On second reading to Finance | |
2009-04-07 | Read 1st time | |
2009-04-07 | On 1st reading | |
2009-04-07 | Immediate consideration | |
2009-04-07 | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance | |
2009-03-26 | To Pensions | |
2009-03-26 | To Pensions then Finance | |
2009-03-26 | Introduced in Senate | |
2009-03-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2009-03-25 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 107) | |
2009-03-25 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2009-03-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 106) | |
2009-03-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-03-25 | Amended on 3rd reading (Roll No. 105) | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Special Calender | |
2009-03-25 | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar | |
2009-03-23 | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 3/24/09 | |
2009-03-23 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-03-20 | Amendments pending | |
2009-03-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-20 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2009-03-19 | Read 1st time | |
2009-03-19 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2009-03-18 | By substitute, do pass | |
2009-03-16 | To House Finance | |
2009-03-16 | Introduced in House | |
2009-03-16 | To Finance | |
2009-03-16 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 12i | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 4 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 2 | 15e | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 3 | 14d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 3 | 14e | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 3 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 3 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 3 | 35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 3 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 13C | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 13C | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 13C | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 13C | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 13C | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 13C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 13C | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 13C | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 13C | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 15 | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 15 | 8b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 15 | 8d | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 15 | 8e | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 22 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22 | 18a | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 22 | 18b | New Code | See Bill Text |
8 | 22 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22 | 20a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22 | 22a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22 | 23a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22 | 26a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 22 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=3158&year=2009&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |