WV HB3135 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 36, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 36, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Expiring the funds to the balance of the Department of Commerce, Development Office
Title
Expiring funds to the balance of the Department of Commerce, Development Office
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 566) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 565) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 403) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 403) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 299) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 298) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 565) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 403) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 403) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 299) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 298) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 36, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/14/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/14/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/14/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-13 | House | To Governor 3/13/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/13/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/13/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 566) |
2019-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 565) |
2019-03-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 403) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 403) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 299) |
2019-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 298) |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | Originating in House Finance |