WV HB3134 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to make technical corrections to the code, allow amnesty payment agreements to extend past two years, require emplyers to notify the Bureau for Child Support Enforcement prior to issuing a bonus to its employees and require a source of income electronically remit support payments via electronic means.
Title
Relating to child support enforcement
Sponsors
Del. Bonnie Brown [D] | Del. Barbara Fleischauer [D] | Del. John Frazier [D] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Del. Clif Moore [D] | Del. Meshea Poore [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - Passage (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - Passage (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 20, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/1/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/1/11 - House Journal | |
2011-04-01 | Approved by Governor 4/1/11 | |
2011-03-31 | To Governor 3/31/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/31/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/31/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 423) | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-10 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-10 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 59) | |
2011-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-10 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 58) | |
2011-03-10 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-10 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-10 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-09 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-09 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-08 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2011-02-28 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-28 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-28 | House Message received | |
2011-02-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 150) | |
2011-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-25 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-24 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-23 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-15 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | 1 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
48 | 1 | 244 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
48 | 1 | 302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
48 | 14 | 408 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
48 | 14 | 410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
48 | 24 | 106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |