WV HB3082 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB3082
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 123, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 123, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Stabilizing funding sources for the DEP Division of Air Quality
Title
Stabilizing funding sources for the DEP Division of Air Quality
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 441) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 216) (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 216) (Y: 76 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 123, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/28/22 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-24 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/24/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/24/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 441) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-24 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-24 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-23 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 216) |
2022-02-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-23 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-22 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-18 | House | With title amendment, do pass |
2022-01-12 | House | To House Finance |
2022-01-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-12 | House | To Finance |
2022-01-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB3082 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |