WV HB3054 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to DNA data collection
Title
Relating to DNA data collection
Sponsors
Del. Barbara Fleischauer [D] | Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] | Del. Linda Longstreth [D] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Del. Carol Miller [R] | Del. Doug Skaff [D] | Del. Kelli Sobonya [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - House - Passage (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 47, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Approved by Governor 4/5/11 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/5/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/5/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-28 | To Governor 3/28/11 | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to House | |
2011-03-12 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 31) | |
2011-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-12 | Returned to calendar by Rules Committee | |
2011-03-11 | Removed from calendar by Rules Committee | |
2011-03-11 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-10 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-09 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-09 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-08 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2011-03-08 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2011-03-03 | To Judiciary | |
2011-03-03 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-03-02 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-02 | Passed House (Roll No. 207) | |
2011-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-02 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-01 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-28 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-28 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-25 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-02-22 | To House Finance | |
2011-02-22 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance | |
2011-02-08 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-08 | To Judiciary then Finance | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB431 (Same As) 2011-02-04 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2B | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2B | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2B | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 2B | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 2B | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2B | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2B | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 2B | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |