WV HB3021 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 131, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 131, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to  require the payment of all civil penalties imposed against thoroughbred horse racing licensees or permit holders to be paid into a fund for expenses associated with the post-mortem examination of all thoroughbreds that suffer breakdowns and are euthanized on a racetrack or that otherwise expire on a racetrack; to require that any funds in excess of $10,000.00 in such fund at the end of a fiscal year, less outstanding obligations, may be expended by the racing commission to aid in the rescue, retraining, rehabilitation and aftercare of thoroughbred racehorses that are no longer able to compete on the racetracks in this state; to authorize the racing commission to promulgate rules to govern the expenditure of any funds used to aid in the rescue, retraining, rehabilitation and aftercare of thoroughbred racehorses that are no longer able to compete on the racetracks in this state; and, to require the payment of all civil penalties imposed against greyhound racing licensees or permit holders to be paid into a fund to be expended for greyhound adoption programs involving West Virginia whelped dogs owned by residents of this state pursuant to rules promulgated by the racing commission.
Title
Relating to the disposition of permit fees, registration fees and civil penalties imposed against thoroughbred horse racing licensees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 358) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 335) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 335) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 131, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/11/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/11/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/11/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 358) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-02 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 335) |
2019-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-02-12 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-12 | House | To Finance |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 23 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |