WV HB302 | 2021 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-20 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-20 - On 3rd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reapportioning Congressional Districts
Title
Reapportioning Congressional Districts
Sponsors
Del. Gary Howell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-20 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2021-10-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2021-10-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-10-14 | House | Postponed on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 10/15/21 |
2021-10-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-10-13 | House | Amendments pending |
2021-10-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-10-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-10-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-10-12 | House | Immediate consideration |
2021-10-12 | House | Do pass |
2021-10-12 | House | Originating in House Select Committee on Redistricting |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 2 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |