WV HB2968 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 180, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 180, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the use of an additional medium for use in archiving the records
Title
Authorizing the use of an additional medium for use in archiving the records
Sponsors
Del. Brent Boggs [D] | Del. Adam Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - House - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 333) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 33) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 31) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 33) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 31) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 180, Acts, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/25/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-25 | House | To Governor 4/25/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/25/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-12 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-12 | House | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 333) |
2013-04-12 | House | House concurred in Senate effective date (Voice) |
2013-04-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur in changed effective date |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Effective July 1, 2013 (Roll No. 33) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate requests return of bill from House |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 31) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-04-04 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 184) |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | Do pass |
2013-03-19 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-19 | House | To Judiciary |
2013-03-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5A | 8 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |