WV HB2958 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to permit the West Virginia Racing Commission to use fees for the registration of colors or assumed names to pay salaries and other budgeted expenses. The bill also clarifies that judges and the Racing Commission may also impose fines.
Title
Allowing the West Virginia Racing Commission to use certain permit and registration fees to pay salaries and other budgeted expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 92, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Approved by Governor 3/30/11 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/30/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/30/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-28 | To Governor 3/28/11 | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to House | |
2011-03-12 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 35) | |
2011-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-12 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 34) | |
2011-03-12 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-12 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-11 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-11 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-11 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-11 | Reported do pass | |
2011-03-03 | To Finance | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-03-02 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-02 | Passed House (Roll No. 198) | |
2011-03-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-02 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-01 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-28 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-28 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-25 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-02-23 | To House Finance | |
2011-02-23 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance | |
2011-02-01 | To House Government Organization | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-01 | To Government Organization then Finance | |
2011-02-01 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB378 (Same As) 2011-02-10 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 23 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |