WV HB2953 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to permit a critical access hospital to become a community outpatient medical center; establishing certain conditions and requirements; and providing for rule-making authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting a critical access hospital to become a community outpatient medical center

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-09HouseOn 2nd reading, House Calendar
2019-02-26HouseFrom Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar
2019-02-25HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-22HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-22HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-21HouseDo pass
2019-02-11HouseTo House Health and Human Resources
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-11HouseTo Health and Human Resources
2019-02-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB593 (Similar To) 2019-03-08 - To Governor 3/8/19

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
165B14Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback