WV HB2953 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Chapter 164, Acts, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Chapter 164, Acts, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to specify that a minimum share of coalbed methane severance tax revenue be distributed to producing counties in an amount at least equal to the share received by nonproducing counties The bill also amends the code to direct the severance tax revenues for coalbed methane producing and nonproducing counties be distributed to the county economic development authorities in lieu of the infrastructure fund.
Title
Relating to dedication of coalbed methane severance tax proceeds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-12 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-28 - House - Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-12 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-28 - House - Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Chapter 164, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/5/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/5/11 - House Journal | |
2011-04-05 | Approved by Governor 4/5/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-28 | To Governor 3/28/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/28/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 414) | |
2011-03-12 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 413) | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-10 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-10 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 51) | |
2011-03-10 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 51) | |
2011-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-10 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 50) | |
2011-03-10 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-10 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-10 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-10 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-09 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-09 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-08 | Reported do pass, with amendment | |
2011-03-01 | To Finance | |
2011-03-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-03-01 | House Message received | |
2011-02-28 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-28 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 159) | |
2011-02-28 | Passed House (Roll No. 158) | |
2011-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-28 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-25 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-24 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-02-10 | To House Finance | |
2011-02-10 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance | |
2011-02-01 | To House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-01 | To Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business then Finance | |
2011-02-01 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB372 (Same As) 2011-02-25 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13A | 20a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | 15A | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |