WV HB2946 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-13 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-13 - From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting the sale of alcoholic beverages on Sunday mornings
Title
Permitting the sale of alcoholic beverages on Sunday mornings
Sponsors
Del. Stephen Skinner [D] | Sen. Jason Barrett [R] | Del. Doug Skaff [D] | Sen. Ryan Ferns [R] |
Del. Barbara Fleischauer [D] | Del. Meshea Poore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-13 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2013-04-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Amendments pending |
2013-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-03-26 | House | To House Finance |
2013-03-26 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-03-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-15 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2013-03-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB628 (Same As) 2013-03-28 - On 2nd reading to Finance
SB358 (Same As) 2013-05-15 - Chapter 138, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
SB358 (Same As) 2013-05-15 - Chapter 138, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 16 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 27 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 27 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 27 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 27 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 3A | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 7 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 8 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 8 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |