WV HB2936 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to change the date of canvassing of votes in a primary election from the Friday following the election to the Monday following.
Title
Changing the date of the canvassing of votes in a primary election
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] | Sen. Mitch Carmichael [R] | Del. Steven Kominar [D] |
Del. Tiffany Lawrence [D] | Del. Scott Varner [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-11 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - Passage (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 61, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-03-24 | Approved by Governor 3/24/11 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/24/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/24/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/18/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/18/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/18/11 | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-11 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-11 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-11 | Passed House (Roll No. 306) | |
2011-03-11 | House concurred in Senate title amendment | |
2011-03-11 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-10 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-10 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 14) | |
2011-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-10 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-09 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-08 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-08 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-08 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2011-03-08 | Reported do pass, with title amendment, but first to Judiciary | |
2011-02-10 | To Government Organization | |
2011-02-10 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2011-02-10 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-10 | House Message received | |
2011-02-09 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-09 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-02-09 | Passed House (Roll No. 72) | |
2011-02-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-09 | On 3rd reading, House Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-08 | On 2nd reading, House Calendar | |
2011-02-07 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-07 | On 1st reading, House Calendar | |
2011-02-04 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-01-28 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-01-28 | Introduced in House | |
2011-01-28 | To Judiciary | |
2011-01-28 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB284 (Same As) 2011-01-26 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 5 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |