WV HB2930 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-04 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow a powerball winner to be anonymous if they elect to be anonymous. The bill also provides an exemption under FOIA if a person elects anonymity.
Title
Allowing powerball, hot lotto, and mega millions winners to remain anonymous
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 229) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Judiciary then Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 229) |
2017-03-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22 | 15a | New Code | See Bill Text |
29B | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |