WV HB2922 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-10 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of the bill is to establish the felony offense of causing serious bodily injury to another person by one who is driving under the influence of alcohol at a time when the driver's privilege to drive has been lawfully suspended or revoked for a driving under the influence of alcohol offense or the driver is participating in the Motor Vehicle Alcohol Test And Lock Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the felony offense of causing serious bodily injury to another person by a person who is driving under the influence of alcohol, controlled substances or other drugs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-14 - House - Passage (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-10 To Judiciary
2011-03-10 Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Judiciary
2011-02-15 To Transportation and Infrastructure
2011-02-15 To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary
2011-02-15 Introduced in Senate
2011-02-15 House Message received
2011-02-14 Communicated to Senate
2011-02-14 Passed House (Roll No. 83)
2011-02-14 Read 3rd time
2011-02-14 On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2011-02-11 Read 2nd time
2011-02-11 On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2011-02-10 Read 1st time
2011-02-10 On 1st reading, Special Calendar
2011-02-09 Placed on Special Calender
2011-02-09 2nd reference dispensed
2011-02-09 By substitute, do pass
2011-01-28 To House Judiciary
2011-01-28 Introduced in House
2011-01-28 To Judiciary then Finance
2011-01-28 Filed for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB250 (Similar To) 2011-01-25 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
SB579 (Similar To) 2011-02-21 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17C52Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback