WV HB2916 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 152, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Semiquincentennial Commission for the celebration of the 250th anniversary of the founding of the United States of America

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the Semiquincentennial Commission for the celebration of the 250th anniversary of the founding of the United States of America

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 342) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 342) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 445) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 444) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 314) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 150) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseChapter 152, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
2021-04-26HouseApproved by Governor 4/26/21
2021-04-10HouseApproved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal
2021-04-10SenateApproved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-10SenateTo Governor 4/22/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-22HouseTo Governor 4/22/21
2021-04-10HouseTo Governor 4/22/21 - House Journal
2021-04-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-04-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2021-04-07SenateCommunicated to House
2021-04-07SenateEffective from passage (Roll No. 342)
2021-04-07SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 342)
2021-04-07SenateHouse Message received
2021-04-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-04-06HouseEffective from passage (Roll No. 445)
2021-04-06HouseHouse concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 444)
2021-04-06HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-04-05SenateSenate requests House to concur
2021-04-05SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 314)
2021-04-05SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-05SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-04-02SenateCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-04-02SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-02SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-04-01SenateRead 1st time
2021-04-01SenateOn 1st reading
2021-03-31SenateReported do pass, with amendment
2021-03-15SenateTo Government Organization
2021-03-15SenateTo Government Organization
2021-03-15SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-03-12HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-03-12HousePassed House (Roll No. 150)
2021-03-12HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-12HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-11HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-11HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-10HouseRead 1st time
2021-03-10HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-03-09HouseBy substitute, do pass
2021-03-04HouseTo House Government Organization
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced in House
2021-03-04HouseTo Government Organization
2021-03-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB555 (Similar To) 2021-03-03 - To Government Organization

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
413A1New CodeSee Bill Text
413A2New CodeSee Bill Text
413A3New CodeSee Bill Text
413A4New CodeSee Bill Text
413A5New CodeSee Bill Text
413A6New CodeSee Bill Text
413A7New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=2916&year=2021&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2916%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2916
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2916%20SUB.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2916
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=HB2916%20SUB%20ENR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=2916
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/HB2916%20S%20GOV%20AM%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/HB2916%20HFA%20SUMMERS%204-6%20_1%20adopted.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00150.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/04-05-0314.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00444.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00445.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/04-07-0342.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback