WV HB2899 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 24, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 24, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Making a supplementary appropriation to the Department of Commerce
Title
Making a supplementary appropriation to the Department of Commerce
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 234) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 234) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 245) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 244) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 234) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 245) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 244) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 24, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | House | Approved by Governor 4/7/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/7/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-07 | House | Approved by Governor 4/7/21 |
2021-04-01 | House | To Governor 4/1/21 |
2021-04-01 | House | To Governor 4/1/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Governor 4/1/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-30 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 234) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 234) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-29 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-03-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-22 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-22 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 245) |
2021-03-22 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 244) |
2021-03-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-22 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-19 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-18 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-03 | House | To House Finance |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-03 | House | To Finance |
2021-03-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB522 (Similar To) 2021-03-02 - To Finance