WV HB2897 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 103, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 103, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
10.0pt;color:windowtext'>The purpose of this bill is to raising the amount required for competitive bidding of construction contracts by the state and its subdivisions, public service districts, and sanitary boards to $50,000; and excepting public service districts from competitive bidding for emergency repairs.
Title
Raising the amount required for competitive bidding of construction contracts by the state and its subdivisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 536) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 417) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 228) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 417) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 228) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 103, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 536) |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 417) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-06 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-05 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-29 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 228) |
2017-03-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-25 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2017-03-25 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | From Special Calendar, 1st reading, placed on House Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-15 | House | To House Government Organization |
2017-03-15 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization |
2017-03-09 | House | To House Industry and Labor |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-09 | House | To Industry and Labor then Government Organization |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 12 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 13 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 13A | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 11 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 1D | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 22 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 16 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |