WV HB2897 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 83, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 83, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Young Entrepreneur Reinvestment Act
Title
Young Entrepreneur Reinvestment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Del. Geoff Foster [R] | Del. Kayla Kessinger [R] | Del. Jordan Hill [R] |
Del. Saira Blair [R] | Del. Michael Ihle [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - Senate - Senate receded and passed (Roll No. 514) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 467) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 188) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 467) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 188) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Chapter 83, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate receded and passed (Roll No. 514) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-12 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Title amendment adopted |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 467) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 3/8/16 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Finance |
2016-02-26 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2016-02-26 | Senate | To Economic Development then Finance |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-02-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-02-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 188) |
2016-02-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | Laid over on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/24 |
2016-02-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-02-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-01-29 | House | To House Finance |
2016-01-29 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2016-01-13 | House | To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development |
2016-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-01-13 | House | To Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Finance |
2016-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |