WV HB2877 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2877
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - To Transportation and Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit public entities, including state, county and municipal buildings and facilities, places of public accommodation and commercial facilities, from charging a fee for parking in an accessible parking space bearing the international symbol of access.
Title
Relating to charging a fee for parking in an accessible parking space bearing the international symbol of access
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 56) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2020-01-30 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-29 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-01-29 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-01-29 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 56) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-29 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-01-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-01-24 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-01-16 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-01-16 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | To House Technology and Infrastructure |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-08 | House | To Technology and Infrastructure then Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2877 (Carry Over) 2019-02-06 - To House Technology and Infrastructure
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 13 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |