WV HB2834 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 150, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 150, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adding the Curator of the West Virginia Division of Arts, Culture and History as an ex officio voting member of the commission
Title
Adding the Curator of the West Virginia Division of Arts, Culture and History as an ex officio voting member of the commission
Sponsors
Del. Paul Espinosa [R] | Del. Gary Howell [R] | Sen. Jason Barrett [R] | Del. Eric Householder [R] |
Del. Joshua Higginbotham [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 349) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 158) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 158) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 150, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/22/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-22 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 |
2021-04-20 | House | To Governor 4/22/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 349) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-03-16 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-15 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 158) |
2021-03-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-03-02 | House | To House Government Organization |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-02 | House | To Government Organization |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB557 (Similar To) 2021-03-03 - To Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 1 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |