WV HB2822 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2822
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - To Military
Pending: Senate Military Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-25 - To Military
Pending: Senate Military Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow honorably discharged veterans who possess certain military ratings to qualify to take an examination for licensing as a plumber, electrician, and sprinkler fitter.
Title
Allowing honorably discharged veterans who possess certain military ratings to qualify to take an examination for licensing as a plumber, electrician, and sprinkler fitter
Sponsors
Del. Gary Howell [R] | Del. John Shott [R] | Del. Guy Ward [R] | Del. Erikka Storch [R] |
Sen. Patrick Martin [R] | Del. Jordan Hill [R] | Del. Anthony Paynter [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 11) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | To Military |
2018-01-25 | Senate | To Military |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-01-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-01-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 11) |
2018-01-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-24 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-23 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-01-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-23 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-01-22 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-19 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2018-01-19 | House | Do pass |
2018-01-10 | House | To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-10 | House | To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Government Organization |
2018-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2822 (Carry Over) 2017-03-08 - To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 14 | 3a | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3B | 4a | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 3D | 4a | New Code | See Bill Text |