WV HB2821 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 317, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 317, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow gambling and lottery winnings to be written off against losses.
Title
Relating to taxation of gambling and lottery winnings
Sponsors
Del. Jarred Cannon [R] | Del. Brandon Steele [R] | Del. Shawn Fluharty [D] | Del. Clay Riley [R] |
Del. William Nestor [R] | Del. Erikka Storch [R] | Del. Paul Espinosa [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 455) (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 152) (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 152) (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Chapter 317, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-22 | House | To Governor 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/22/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-11 | House | House received Senate message |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 455) |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2023-02-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2023-02-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-15 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 152) |
2023-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-10 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-02-02 | House | To House Finance |
2023-02-02 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2023-01-19 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-19 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2377 (Similar To) 2023-01-11 - To House Finance
HB2808 (Similar To) 2023-01-19 - To House Judiciary
SB483 (Similar To) 2023-01-26 - To Finance
HB2808 (Similar To) 2023-01-19 - To House Judiciary
SB483 (Similar To) 2023-01-26 - To Finance