WV HB2812 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-01 - To Pensions
Pending: Senate Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-01 - To Pensions
Pending: Senate Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify use of subsistence allowance in determining compensation for purposes of calculating pension benefits for natural resources police officers.
Title
Clarifying use of subsistence allowance in determining compensation for purposes of calculating pension benefits for natural resources police officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-28 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 255) (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 254) (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 254) (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-01 | Senate | To Pensions |
2015-03-01 | Senate | To Pensions |
2015-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-28 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-28 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 255) |
2015-02-28 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 254) |
2015-02-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-26 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-25 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-02-19 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-19 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2015-02-18 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-18 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 7 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |