WV HB2810 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to direct the West Virginia Housing Development Fund to implement a statewide property rescue initiative, to allocate $1 million per year for five years to a revolving loan program, to provide for removal or rehabilitation of dilapidated housing throughout the state by counties and municipalities through training, technical services, and consultation, and with annual reports to the Legislature.
Title
Implementing the West Virginia Property Rescue Initiative to reduce the number of properties posing a threat to public health and safety
Sponsors
Del. Nancy Peoples Guthrie [D] | Del. Mike Pushkin [D] | Del. Andrew Byrd [D] | Del. Larry Rowe [D] |
Del. John McCuskey [R] | Del. Brad White [R] | Del. Christopher Stansbury [R] | Del. Ron Walters [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 25) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 361) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 361) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/15 - House Journal |
2015-04-01 | House | Approved by Governor 4/1/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/1/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/27/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-27 | House | To Governor 3/27/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 25) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 3/6/15 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2015-03-06 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 361) |
2015-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2015-02-28 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-02-18 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-18 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed for introduction |