WV HB2758 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 203, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 203, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Insurance Commissioner to regulate professional bondsmen
Title
Requiring the Insurance Commissioner to regulate professional bondsmen
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Barrett [R] | Del. John Paul Hott [R] | Del. Steve Westfall [R] | Del. Mick Bates [D] |
Del. Ken Reed [R] | Del. Larry Rowe [D] | Del. Larry Pack [R] | Del. Tom Fast [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 504) (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 347) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 138) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 347) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 138) (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 203, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-14 | House | To Governor 4/14/21 |
2021-04-10 | House | To Governor 4/14/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-10 | Senate | To Governor 4/14/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-04-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 504) |
2021-04-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 347) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2021-03-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-15 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-12 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-12 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 138) |
2021-03-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-10 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2021-03-04 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-04 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-24 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | 10 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |