WV HB2745 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The bill provides that certain information submitted by insurance companies to the insurance commissioner is confidential and exempt from the freedom of information disclosure requirements. The bill provides those documents may not be subject to subpoena or discoverable in a private civil action. The bill also authorizes rulemaking.
Title
Providing that certain information provided by insurance companies to the Insurance Commissioner is confidential
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Ashley [R] | Del. Tom Azinger [R] | Sen. Daniel Hall [D] | Del. William Hartman [D] |
Del. David Perry [D] | Del. Ron Walters [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Passage-senate Amended Hb (Y: 90 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 97, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/4/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/4/11 - House Journal | |
2011-04-04 | Approved by Governor 4/4/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/31/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-31 | To Governor 3/31/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/31/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to House | |
2011-03-12 | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 67) | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 460) | |
2011-03-12 | Conference report received-House | |
2011-03-12 | Conference report filed - Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Conference report filed - House | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | To conference | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | House appointed conferees: Michael, Poore, Ireland | |
2011-03-12 | House agreed to conference | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-12 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-12 | Senate appoints conference committee: Minard, Jenkins, Hall | |
2011-03-12 | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) | |
2011-03-12 | House received Senate message | |
2011-03-10 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2011-03-10 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 8) | |
2011-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-10 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-03-09 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-09 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-03-08 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2011-03-08 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 3/4/11 | |
2011-03-04 | On 2nd reading to Judiciary | |
2011-03-04 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-04 | On 1st reading | |
2011-03-04 | Immediate consideration | |
2011-03-04 | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2011-02-28 | To Banking and Insurance | |
2011-02-28 | To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary | |
2011-02-28 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-28 | House Message received | |
2011-02-25 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-25 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2011-02-25 | Passed House (Roll No. 143) | |
2011-02-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-25 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-24 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-23 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-22 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-01-21 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-01-21 | Introduced in House | |
2011-01-21 | To Judiciary | |
2011-01-21 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB217 (Same As) 2011-01-19 - To Banking and Insurance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 4 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 4A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 4A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 4A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 4A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 4A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 4A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 4A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 4A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |