WV HB2728 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to adopt a National Association of Insurance Commissioners’ model to establish standards for minimum capital and surplus to be maintained by a health organization and provide for the early detection of a potentially hazardous or otherwise dangerous financial condition of a health organization in order to protect its enrollees and the general public.
Title
Relating to risk-based capital reporting for health organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 276) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-03-03 | Senate | To Finance |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 276) |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-26 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-02-20 | House | To House Finance |
2015-02-20 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2015-02-13 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2015-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-13 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2015-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB368 (Same As) 2015-02-10 - To Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 24 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 25 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 25A | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 25D | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 40 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 40 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 40 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 40 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 40 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 40A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 40A | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 40A | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 40A | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 40A | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 40A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 40A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 40A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 40A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 40A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 40A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 40A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 40A | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |