WV HB2721 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 220, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 220, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to eliminate the cap on the size of projects constructed by the Division of Highways and to remove the sunset date.
Title
Removing the cost limitation on projects completed by the Division of Highways
Sponsors
Del. Tim Armstead [R] | Del. Tim Miley [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 514) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 568) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 172) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 568) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 172) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 220, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 4/24/17 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/18/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/18/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-18 | House | To Governor 4/18/17 |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 514) |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 568) |
2017-04-08 | House | Conference report received-House |
2017-04-08 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | To conference |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House appointed conferees: Walters, Gearheart, Bates |
2017-04-08 | House | House agreed to conference |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate appoints conference committee: Boso, Swope, Jeffries |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate refused to recede; requested conference (Voice vote) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | House refused to concur; requested Senate to recede (Voice) |
2017-04-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 304) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/29/17 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Committee reference dispensed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 172) |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-20 | House | To House Finance |
2017-03-20 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-02-27 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-27 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Finance |
2017-02-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB416 (Similar To) 2017-03-29 - Committed to Rules on 3rd reading
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 27 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 27 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |