WV HB2679 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 163, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 163, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit county park commissions from prohibiting firearms in their facilities and to clarify that a firearm may be carried by a person for self defense in state parks, state forests and state recreational areas managed by the Department of Natural Resources, provided that such person is not otherwise prohibited from possessing firearms.
Title
Relating to the possession of firearms in parks and park facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 526) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 314) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 160) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 150) (Y: 7 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 314) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 160) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Amendment rejected (Roll No. 150) (Y: 7 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Chapter 163, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 526) |
2017-04-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 314) |
2017-04-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/31/17 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/29/17 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2017-03-25 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-25 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-03-25 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-24 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 160) |
2017-03-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-24 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | Amendment rejected (Roll No. 150) |
2017-03-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-15 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-02-23 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-02-23 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2017-02-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 19a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2 | 42g | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2 | 42h | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 11 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |