WV HB2655 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2655
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defining and establishing the crime of cyberbullying
Title
Defining and establishing the crime of cyberbullying
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 534) (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 417) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 42) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 417) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 42) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 60, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/19/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-19 | House | To Governor 3/19/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/19/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 534) |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 417) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2018-02-06 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 42) |
2018-02-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-05 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-02 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-02-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-02-01 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-31 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-10 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-10 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2655 (Carry Over) 2017-02-22 - To House Judiciary