WV HB2606 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 77, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 77, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to clarify the potential sentence for disorderly conduct by removing language that a person may be "committed to the custody of the Division of Corrections" rather than "confined in jail" which is inserted.
Title
Clarifying the potential sentence for disorderly conduct
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 95) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 95) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 77, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 19) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-02-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 95) |
2015-02-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-16 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-12 | House | Do pass |
2015-02-04 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-04 | House | To Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 6 | 1b | Amended Code | Citation Text |